Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033231

EP1033231 - Molding material containing reinforcing fibers, method for producing molded articles using same and safety shoe toe cap [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.11.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.12.2004  [2004/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YKK Corporation
No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 8642 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
YKK Corporation
No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 8642 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Yoshiharu
428, Tanaka, Nyuzen-machi
Shimoniikawa-gun, Toyama 939-00672 / JP
02 / Takizawa, Takato
452, Tenjinshin
Kurobe-shi, Toyama 938-0042 / JP
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Casalonga, Axel , et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00103315.818.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateJP1999004376922.02.1999         Original published format: JP 4376999
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033231
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033231
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033231
Date:02.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29C70/46, B29B15/10, B29D31/515, A43B23/16
[2001/03]
Former International [2000/36]B29C70/46, B29D31/515, A43B23/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/40]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Formmaterial mit Verstärkungsfasern, Verfahren zur Herstellung geformten Gegenständen aus diesem Material und Sicherheitszehenkappe eines Schuhes[2000/36]
English:Molding material containing reinforcing fibers, method for producing molded articles using same and safety shoe toe cap[2000/36]
French:Matière de moulage comprenant des fibres de renforcement, procédé de fabrication des articles moulés avec cette matière et embout de sécurité d'orteils pour chaussure[2000/36]
Examination procedure11.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/32]
18.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.03.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
28.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2003Fee for grant paid
04.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.09.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5470656  (KENNARD JEFFREY L [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 45 - line 67; figure 3; claims 1-3 *;
 [X]US5747137  (CUTOLO DOMINGO [IT], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 20 - line 39; figure 2 * * column 3, line 35 - line 50; claims 1-3,5-8 *;
 [YA]US5756206  (DAVIES ROBERT M [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 45 - line 54; claim 1 * * column 5, line 30 - line 34 * * column 6, line 62 - line 64 * [A] 5;
 [YA]US5206085  (NAKAGAWA TAKAO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 3 - line 34; figure 1 * * column 8, line 4 - line 8 * [A] 5;
 [A]US5185117  (HAWLEY RONALD CLARE [US]) [A] 5 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0207322  (HOSIDEN ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 6 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2740149  (YKK CORP [JP]) [A] 6 * abstract *