Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039718

EP1039718 - Data communication method terminal equipment, interconnecting installation, data communication system and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.05.2016
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.06.2016  [2016/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takeda, Kenji
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Osawa, Tomoki
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Baronetzky, Klaus , et al
Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00103402.424.02.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateJP1999005113226.02.1999         Original published format: JP 5113299
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039718
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039718
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/39]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Datenübertragungsverfahren, Endgerät, Verbindungsanlage, Datenübertragungssystem, und Aufzeichnungsmedium[2000/39]
English:Data communication method terminal equipment, interconnecting installation, data communication system and recording medium[2000/39]
French:Procédé de communication de données, équipement terminal, installation d'interconnexion, système de communication de données et support d'enregistrement[2000/39]
Examination procedure16.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/03]
04.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/26]
23.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/26]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.10.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
04.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
05.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
04.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
02.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
03.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201617   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5007051  (DOLKAS GREGORY D [US], et al) [X] 1-66 * column W *;
 [X]  A.S. TANENBAUM, COMPUTER NETWORKS., LONDON, UK, PRENTICE-HALL INTERNATIONAL., XP002218924 [X] 1-66 * paragraph [03.4] *
 [X]  W.R.STEVENS, TCP/IP ILLUSTRATED, VOLUME 1, THE PROTOCOLS, READING, US, ADDISSON-WESLEY, XP002218925 [X] 1-66 * CHAPTER 18 *