Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036796

EP1036796 - Method for producing phosphabenzene compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mackewitz, Thomas Dr.
Schmitzstrasse 8
68219 Mannheim / DE
02 / Roeper, Michael, Dr.
Pegauerstrasse 10
67157 Wachenheim / DE
03 / Breit, Prof. Dr. Bernhard
Odenwaldstrasse 2
69198 Schriesheim / DE
 [2001/19]
Former [2000/38]01 / Mackewitz, Thomas Dr.
Schmitzstrasse 8
68219 Mannheim / DE
02 / Roeper, Michael, Dr.
Pegauerstrasse 10
67157 Wachenheim / DE
Representative(s)Isenbruck, Günter
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Isenbruck, Günter, Dr.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date00103428.925.02.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateDE199911192217.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19911922
[2000/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036796
Date:20.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036796
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07F9/6568
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Phosphabenzolverbindungen[2000/38]
English:Method for producing phosphabenzene compounds[2000/38]
French:Procédé de préparation de composés phosphabenzene[2000/38]
Examination procedure24.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
09.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
20.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2002Fee for grant paid
10.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
AT25.02.2003
CY25.02.2003
LU25.02.2003
MC28.02.2003
[2007/10]
Former [2005/02]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
AT25.02.2003
CY25.02.2003
LU25.02.2003
MC28.02.2003
Former [2004/44]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
AT25.02.2003
CY25.02.2003
LU25.02.2003
Former [2004/39]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
AT25.02.2003
LU25.02.2003
Former [2004/31]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
AT25.02.2003
Former [2003/42]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
IE25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/29]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/20]FI25.09.2002
GR25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]FI25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE1668416  (MAERKL GOTTFRIED PROF DR) [DA] 1-9 * examples 1,2 *;
 [PDA]WO9916774  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [PDA] 1-9 * page 13; examples 10-14; claims 1-8 *;
 [DA]WO9746507  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-9 * page 14, line 39 - page 15, line 3; claim 14 *