Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033598

EP1033598 - Connector and fixing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yatagai, Tsuyoshi
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/36]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00103450.329.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateJP1999005210101.03.1999         Original published format: JP 5210199
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033598
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44, H02G15/14
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/21]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbinder und zugehöriges Fixierungsverfahren[2000/36]
English:Connector and fixing method thereof[2000/36]
French:Connecteur et methode de fixation[2000/36]
Examination procedure28.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
07.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/03]
02.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0640786  (PFLITSCH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [YA]FR2728047  (AEG SCHNEIDER AUTOMATION [FR]) [Y] 1-5 * figure -; claim - * [A] 7,10;
 [Y]FR2758400  (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SA [FR]) [Y] 1-5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]US5573423  (LIN KUANG-TS AN [TW], et al) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]US5278358  (BLONDIN JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR]) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - *