Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1031683

EP1031683 - Vehicle door handle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
U-Shin Italia S.p.A.
Via Torino 31
10044 Pianezza / IT
[2014/22]
Former [2009/18]For all designated states
Valeo S.p.A.
Via Asti 89
10026 Santena (TO) / IT
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
Valeo Sicurezza Abitacolo S.p.A.
Via Asti, 89
10026 Santena / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Savant, Fiorenzo
Via Vacchieri, 3
10093 Collegno / IT
[2000/35]
Representative(s)Prinz & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 31 04 20
80104 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/22]Larger, Solène , et al
U-Shin France SAS
Service Propriété Industrielle
2-10, rue Claude Nicolas Ledoux
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2011/08]Jacquot, Ludovic R. G. , et al
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Propriété Industrielle 76 rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2009/36]Jacquot, Ludovic R. G. , et al
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Propriété Industrielle 42 Rue Le Corbusier Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2009/18]Jacquot, Ludovic R. G. , et al
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2009/15]Jacquot, Ludovic R. G.
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2009/02]Prinz & Partner
Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2006/39]Degwert, Hartmut , et al
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2004/40]Rosolen-Delarue, Katell
Valeo Securité Habitacle, Service Propriété Industrielle, 42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc
94042 Creteil Cedex / FR
Former [2004/05]Hervouet, Sylvie , et al
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle S.A.S. Service Propriété Industrielle 42, rue Le Corbusier Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2002/26]Croonenbroek, Thomas , et al
Valeo Securité Habitacle, 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2000/35]Cerbaro, Elena, Dr. , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date00103644.121.02.2000
[2000/35]
Priority number, dateIT1999TO0014123.02.1999         Original published format: IT TO990141
[2000/35]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1031683
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1031683
Date:18.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:E05B7/00
[2000/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/20]
Former [2000/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Türgriff für Kraftfahrzeug[2000/35]
English:Vehicle door handle[2000/35]
French:Poignée pour porte de véhicule[2000/35]
Examination procedure02.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
11.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2005Fee for grant paid
21.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.02.2006   
Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG
Steeger Strasse 17
42551 Velbert / DE
Opponent's representative
Vogel, Andreas, et al
Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel, Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/15]
Opponent(s)01  20.02.2006   
Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH. & Co. KG.
Steeger Strasse 17
42551 Velbert / DE
Opponent's representative
Vogel, Andreas, et al
Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel, Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
29.03.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.02.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.10.2007Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2008Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
26.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.06.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1835/17
26.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
30.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1835/17
12.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
12.04.2001M01   Fee paid on   02.05.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
GB21.02.2006
[2007/27]
Former [2006/14]SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
Former [2005/50]SE18.08.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19633894  (HUF HÜLSBECK & FÜRST GMBH & CO. KG) [X] 1-6,11,12 * the whole document * [A] 7,13;
 [A]DE4212291  (MERCEDES-BENZ AG) [A] 1 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 42; figures 1,2 *