Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035620

EP1035620 - Fixing of a connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Hackel, Oliver
Am Hundsbusch 40
42111 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Schekalla, Peter P.
Engelshöhe 24
42329 Wuppertal / DE
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/37]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date00103647.421.02.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateDE199910974005.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19909740
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035620
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035620
Date:20.03.2002
[2002/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035620
Date:05.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/74, H01R13/506
[2002/12]
Former International [2000/37]H01R13/74
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/50]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Befestigung eines Verbinders[2000/37]
English:Fixing of a connector[2000/37]
French:Fixation d' un connecteur[2000/37]
Examination procedure06.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/35]
23.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2006Fee for grant paid
16.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB05.07.2006
ES16.10.2006
[2008/04]
Former [2007/35]GB05.07.2006
IT05.07.2006
ES16.10.2006
Former [2007/28]GB05.07.2006
ES16.10.2006
Former [2007/12]ES16.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19548543  (DELPHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4,8-10,13-15,17 * column 4, line 18 - line 27 * * column 5, line 8 - line 38 * * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 62; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]EP0615315  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1-3,13 * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 50; figures 1-3 *