Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1031810

EP1031810 - Filter-heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 14.04.2010  [2010/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nagaoka, Tadayoshi
573-2, Oaza Ureshi
Tondabayashi-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
Nagaoka, Tadayoshi
573-2, Oaza Ureshi
Tondabayashi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagaoka, Tadayoshi
573-2 Oaza Ureshi
Tondabayashi-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
02 / Weismantel, Guy Edward
P.O. Box 6269
Kingwood, Texas 7325 / US
[2000/35]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/47]Dallmeyer, Georg , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2000/35]Dallmeyer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00103663.122.02.2000
[2000/35]
Priority number, dateUS1999026052426.02.1999         Original published format: US 260524
[2000/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1031810
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1031810
Date:26.09.2001
[2001/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F28F19/01, F28D7/00, F28F21/06, B01D29/15, B01D29/11, B01D29/01, B01D29/84, F28D7/02
[2001/39]
Former International [2000/35]F28F19/01, F28D7/00, F28F21/06, B01D29/15, B01D29/11, B01D29/01
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2002/24]
Former [2000/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Filter- Wärmetauscher[2000/35]
English:Filter-heat exchanger[2000/35]
French:Filtre-échangeur de chaleur[2000/35]
Examination procedure22.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
18.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/36]
04.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200506   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]CH617413  (WULLSCHLEGER OTTO) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,11,12 * figure 1; claims 1-3 * [Y] 3;
 [XY]GB584174  (GEN MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 3;
 [X]US3097165  (WALTER KASTEN) [X] 1 * column 2; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]GB2290864  (FAN KUO FU [TW]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 *