Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032213

EP1032213 - Video transcoding method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uenoyama, Tsutomu
1-15-5-903, Ikeda, Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Komiya, Daisaku
2-4-10, Matsunoki, Suginami-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Iwasaki, Osamu
1-36-A201, Toushincho, Itabashi-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Etoh, Minoru
510-1-101, Suenaga, Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/35]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00103728.222.02.2000
[2000/35]
Priority number, dateJP1999004621724.02.1999         Original published format: JP 4621799
[2000/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1032213
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1032213
Date:28.04.2004
[2004/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032213
Date:26.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/50, H04N7/26
[2004/18]
Former International [2000/35]H04N7/26, H04N7/50
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/03]
Former [2000/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Videotranskodierung[2000/35]
English:Video transcoding method and apparatus[2000/35]
French:Procédé et dispositif de transcodage vidéo[2000/35]
Examination procedure31.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/44]
09.09.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
09.01.2006Fee for grant paid
09.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14]
Request for further processing for:04.11.2005Request for further processing filed
04.11.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.01.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0845908  (SNELL & WILCOX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-42 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 31 * * column 5, line 6 - column 9, line 10 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]WO9819460  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-42 * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line 34 * * page 9, line 28 - page 14, line 2 * * page 22, line 1 - page 24, line 16 * * figures 3A,B *;
 [X]EP0823822  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-42 * page 2, line 41 - page 5, line 23 * * page 6, line 3 - page 9, line 21 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]US5657416  (BOON CHOONG SENG [JP]) [X] 1-42 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 47 * * column 5, line 7 - column 8, line 24 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]WO9740626  (ELECTROCRAFT LAB LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1-42 * page 3, line 2 - line 27 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]  BJOERK N ET AL, "TRANSCODER ARCHITECTURES FOR VIDEO CODING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19980201), vol. 44, no. 1, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 88 - 98, XP000779254 [X] 1-42 * paragraphs [0004] , [5.1.1] * * figures 3-7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.663734
 [X]  TUDOR P N ET AL, "REAL-TIME TRANSCODING OF MPEG-2 VIDEO BIT STREAMS", INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CONVENTION, LONDON, GB, (19970901), no. 447, pages 296 - 301,COMPL, XP000668774 [X] 1-42 * page 297 - page 298 * * figures 5,6 * * table 1 *
 [A]  KEESMAN G ET AL, "Transcoding of MPEG bitstreams", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960901), vol. 8, no. 6, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 481 - 500, XP004047113 [A] 1-42 * paragraph [0003] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(95)00067-4