Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038476

EP1038476 - Spring element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hartmann, Siegbert
Neuer Kamp 71
32584 Löhne / DE
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Rolf, Gudrun
Rechtsanwältin
Rosenstein, Rolf, Frohoff
Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB, Nickelstrasse 21
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]Rolf, Gudrun
Musiol Konrad Rolf Frohoff Fübi Rechtsanwalts und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Elsa-Brändström-Strasse 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2000/39]Rolf, Gudrun
Rechtsanwältin, Niederwall 22
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date00103767.023.02.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateDE1999203423U25.02.1999         Original published format: DE 29903423 U
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1038476
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038476
Date:21.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47C23/00, A47C23/06
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:Federelement[2000/39]
English:Spring element[2000/39]
French:Elément de ressort[2000/39]
Examination procedure21.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/09]
18.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.01.2004Fee for grant paid
02.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI21.04.2004
GB21.04.2004
IE21.04.2004
NL21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
PT21.09.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2006/13]FI21.04.2004
GB21.04.2004
IE21.04.2004
NL21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/19]FI21.04.2004
GB21.04.2004
IE21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/18]FI21.04.2004
GB21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/06]FI21.04.2004
GB21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/02]FI21.04.2004
GB21.04.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/01]GB21.04.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2004/52]SE21.07.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4411703  (BAUMJOHANN FERDINAND [DE]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - * [A] 2-4,6,8-10;
 [A]DE9317114U  (FROLI KUNSTSTOFFE HEINRICH FRO [DE]) [A] 1,4,6,10 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0401712  (SUPERBA SA [CH]) [A] 1,4,6,10 * figure -; claim 1 *
by applicantEP0653174