blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1005164

EP1005164 - Variable frequency divider [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP
For all designated states
Tottori Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.
201 Minamiyoshikata 3-chome
Tottori-shi, Tottori-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP
For all designated states
Tottori Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.
201 Minamiyoshikata 3-chome
Tottori-shi Tottori-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sumi, Yasuaki, Tottori Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd.
201, Minamiyoshikata 3-chome
Tottori-shi, Tottori-ken / JP
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date00103796.925.09.1996
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateJP1996000164409.01.1996         Original published format: JP 164496
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1005164
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1005164
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.04.2000
ClassificationIPC:H03K23/66, H03L7/197
[2000/22]
CPC:
H03K23/667 (EP); H03L7/087 (EP); H03L7/1974 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Einstellbarer Frequenzteiler[2000/22]
English:Variable frequency divider[2000/22]
French:Diviseur de fréquence ajustable[2000/22]
Examination procedure09.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
28.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2002Fee for grant paid
18.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96115394.7  / EP0766403
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
18.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9007232  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 16 - page 10, line 31 * * page 17, line 30 - page 18, line 11 * * page 20, line 28 - page 21, line 31 * * page 24, line 10 - page 24, line 22 *;
 [A]US4935944  (EVERETT JODY H [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 65 - column 7, line 42 *;
 [A]US4573176  (YEAGER RICHARD O [US]) [A] * column 2, line 45 - column 6, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0566274  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] * column 3, line 56 - column 5, line 41 *;
 [A]US5063579  (SASAKI LAWRENCE H [CA], et al) [A] * column W *;
 [A]US3967205  (ROSSI UMBERTO, et al) [A] * column W *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.