Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1057516

EP1057516 - Process for CS2 adsorption [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Degussa GmbH
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Degussa AG
Bennigsenplatz 1
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
Weissfrauenstrasse 9
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Frey, Thomas
Geiersrainweg 2 B
63776 Mömbris / DE
02 / Niklaus, Anja
Schönstrasse 36
60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE
03 / Maier, Hans-Josef
Hemsbacher Strasse 11
63755 Alzenau / DE
04 / Sextl, Elfriede
Am Frohnbügel 11
63826 Geiselbach / DE
[2000/49]
Application number, filing date00103867.824.02.2000
[2000/49]
Priority number, dateDE199911797721.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19917977
[2000/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1057516
Date:06.12.2000
Language:DE
[2000/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/04
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   IT,   LI,   SE [2001/34]
Former [2000/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Adsorption von CS2[2000/49]
English:Process for CS2 adsorption[2000/49]
French:Procédé d'adsorption de CS2[2000/49]
Examination procedure24.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
24.02.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
17.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
29.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/36]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2337754  (GRACE W R & CO) [A] 1-3,7 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 6 - page 10, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]US5563301  (PRESTON KYLE L [US], et al) [A] 1-4,7 * column 4, line 46 - line 63; table 2 *;
 [A]GB1207925  (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1,7 * page 2, line 33 - line 100; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0742041  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]);
 [A]GB966404  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG)