Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033118

EP1033118 - Nasal dilator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Delmore, Michael D.
3M Innovative Properties Company, P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
02 / Pendergrass, Daniel B., Jr.
3M Innovative Properties Company, P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
03 / Neeser, Roger D.
3M Innovative Properties Company, P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
04 / Mallo, Richard A.
3M Innovative Properties Company, P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00103868.624.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateUS1999026044502.03.1999         Original published format: US 260445
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033118
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033118
Date:20.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/08
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/21]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nasaler Dilatator[2000/36]
English:Nasal dilator[2000/36]
French:Dilatateur nasal[2000/36]
Examination procedure05.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
07.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.07.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
25.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
11.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2005Fee for grant paid
02.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.04.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.04.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9857613  (BIOFARM SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-11,13-19,22,23 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 36; example 2; claim - * [Y] 20,21;
 [Y]EP0195254  (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US]) [Y] 20,21 * abstract *;
 [AD]US5706800  (CRONK PETER J [US], et al);
 [A]US5455043  (FISCHEL-GHODSIAN FARIBA [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9827897  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US])
by applicantUS5706800
 US5549103
 US4414977
 US1292083
 US1950839
 US5476091
 US5533499
 US5533503