Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033089

EP1033089 - Slide fastener tape [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YKK Corporation
No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
YKK CORPORATION
No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsushima, Hideyuki
369, Kubota, Asahi-machi
Shimoniikawa-gun, Toyama-ken / JP
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
[2008/41]
Former [2000/36]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7, II Aufgang
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date00103900.724.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateJP1999004992026.02.1999         Original published format: JP 4992099
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033089
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033089
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:A44B19/34
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/21]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Reissverschlussband[2000/36]
English:Slide fastener tape[2000/36]
French:Ruban de fermeture à glissière[2000/36]
Examination procedure05.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
30.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2004Fee for grant paid
29.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AD]FR1566806  (PRYM) [AD] 1 * figure 1; claim A *;
 [A]FR2427804  (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1,5-7 * figures 1-3; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]GB2062035  (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK) [A] 1,4,5 * page 1, line 85 - line 110; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]GB2072743  (INTERBREV SA) [A] 3 * page 2, line 10 - line 16; figures 1-3 *