EP1035619 - Electrical Connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEAG Sicherheitstechnik GmbH Senator-Schwartz-Ring 26 59494 Soest / DE | [2000/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarz, Gerhard Zollernwaldstrasse 9 69436 Allemühl / DE | 02 /
Naumann, Reiner In den Hopfengärten 14 68239 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Deschner, Helmut Allensteinerstrasse 1/1 69412 Eberbach / DE | 04 /
Grimm, Theo Sonnenhalde 5 69427 Mudau / DE | 05 /
Hofmann, Gerd Tillsiterstrasse 10 69412 Eberbach / DE | 06 /
Sauer, Dieter Pfarrweg 2 69434 Heddesbach / DE | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103904.9 | 24.02.2000 | [2000/37] | Priority number, date | DE1999204053U | 05.03.1999 Original published format: DE 29904053 U | [2000/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1035619 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035619 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/595, H01R13/52 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
H01R13/5205 (EP,US);
H01R13/5816 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | Stecker | [2000/37] | English: | Electrical Connector | [2000/37] | French: | Connecteur électrique | [2000/37] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.10.2003 | FI | 08.10.2003 | IE | 08.10.2003 | DK | 08.01.2004 | GR | 08.01.2004 | ES | 19.01.2004 | PT | 08.03.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 08.10.2003 | |
FI | 08.10.2003 | ||
IE | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
ES | 19.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 08.10.2003 | |
IE | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
ES | 19.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 08.10.2003 | |
IE | 08.10.2003 | ||
DK | 08.01.2004 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 08.10.2003 | |
IE | 08.10.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 08.10.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 08.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3739318 (WINTER P, et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 12 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0161910 (THOMAS & BETTS CORP [US]) [A] 16-20,25-32 * page 3, line 6 - page 8, line 20 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE9015056U (FRANZ BINDER GMBH & CO) [A] 33-37 * page 6, line 10 - line 20 ** figure 1 * |