EP1031976 - Magneto-optical head and magneto-optical device and magneto-optical recording/reproducing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Junsaku 432-23, Yamanobo-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara 634-0071 / JP | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103918.9 | 24.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | JP19990048956 | 25.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4895699 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1031976 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1031976 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/105 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B7/1372 (EP,US);
G11B11/10547 (EP,US);
G11B11/10576 (EP,US);
G11B7/1387 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2002/21] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magneto-optischer Kopf, magneto-optische Vorrichtung und magneto-optisches Aufzeichnungs- Wiedergabeverfahren | [2000/35] | English: | Magneto-optical head and magneto-optical device and magneto-optical recording/reproducing method | [2000/35] | French: | Tête et dispositif magnéto-optique et méthode d'enregistrement/reproduction magnéto-optique | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 19.01.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/06] | 05.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6025037 ; | [A]US5808973 (TANAKA YOICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,15,18,19,21* column 6, line 62 - column 8, line 31; figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO9849675 (TERASTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1,15,16,18,19,21 * page 20, line 15 - page 34, line 10; figures 3-12C * * page 72, line 1 - page 73, line 6; figure 28F * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850622), vol. 009, no. 148, Database accession no. (P - 366), & JP60025037 A 19850207 (SHIROU OKAMURA) [A] 1,15,16,19,21 * abstract * |