Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033739

EP1033739 - Lamp with a slip-on envelope retainer and clamp ring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OSRAM SYLVANIA INC.
100 Endicott Street
Danvers, MA 01923 / US
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Coushaine, Charles M.
56 Birch Drive
Rindge, New Hampshire 03461 / US
02 / Lukkarinen, Mark A.
87 Mallard Point Road
Merrimack New Hampshire 03054 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Lemke, Jörg-Michael
Jung HML
Patentanwälte
Hofmarkstrasse 10 - Arnhofen
86447 Aindling / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Lemke, Jörg-Michael, Dipl.-Ing.
Schmiedstrasse 1, Hausen
86447 Aindling / DE
Application number, filing date00103930.425.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateUS1999026040201.03.1999         Original published format: US 260402
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033739
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033739
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01J5/48
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:Lampe mit einem aufsetzbaren Kolbenhalter und Klemmring[2000/36]
English:Lamp with a slip-on envelope retainer and clamp ring[2000/36]
French:Lampe à organe de retenue de l'enveloppe enfilable et anneau de blocage[2000/36]
Examination procedure18.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
08.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
12.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2003Fee for grant paid
18.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Request for further processing for:21.10.2002Request for further processing filed
21.10.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.11.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.2003
CH02.05.2003
CY02.05.2003
FI02.05.2003
LI02.05.2003
DK02.08.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
[2007/08]
Former [2004/23]AT02.05.2003
CH02.05.2003
FI02.05.2003
LI02.05.2003
DK02.08.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
Former [2004/05]AT02.05.2003
CH02.05.2003
FI02.05.2003
LI02.05.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
Former [2004/03]AT02.05.2003
CH02.05.2003
LI02.05.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
Former [2004/02]CH02.05.2003
LI02.05.2003
GR02.08.2003
SE02.08.2003
PT04.08.2003
Former [2004/01]CH02.05.2003
LI02.05.2003
SE02.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE02.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9620493  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]US2653304  (WADSWORTH HOWARD M) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 7; figure - *;
 [A]GB1032163  (PRESSAC LTD) [A] 1,4 * page 1, line 35; figures 1-4 * * page 1, line 42 - line 45 * * page 1, line 74 - line 79 *;
 [PA]EP0930635  (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [PA] 1,4 * abstract * * column 4, line 9 - line 44 *