Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033420

EP1033420 - Process and apparatus for electrochemically graining a support for light-sensitive layers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[2004/05]
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert AG
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee
51373 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Haby, Georg
Im Kornfeld 1
65635 Liederbach / DE
02 / Haas, Raimund, Dr.
Mühlwiese 11A
65779 Kelkheim / DE
03 / Gartmann, Uwe
Zeilstrasse 23
65347 Eltville / DE
04 / Hultzsch, Günter, Dr.
Volkerstrasse 42
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
05 / Joerg, Klaus, Dr.
In der Bitz Nr. 5
55128 Ingelheim / DE
06 / Kaden, Jörg
Dietzer Strasse 19
56368 Klingelbach / DE
07 / Idstein, Hermann
Schillerstrasse 39
65375 Oestrich-Winkel / DE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/03]
Former [2001/49]Terrell, David Richard , et al
Agfa-Gevaert N.V., Corporate Intellectual Property, Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Former [2000/36]Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle Albert, Rheingaustrasse 190-196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date00104028.626.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateDE199910888402.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19908884
[2000/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1033420
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033420
Date:28.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C25F3/04, C25F7/00, B41N3/03
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesBE,   FR,   GB [2001/21]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum elektrochemischen Aufrauhen eines Trägers für lichtempfindliche Schichten[2000/36]
English:Process and apparatus for electrochemically graining a support for light-sensitive layers[2000/36]
French:Procédé et dispositif de grainage électrochimique de supports de couches sensibles à la lumière[2000/36]
Examination procedure17.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
07.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.06.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT
27.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2003Fee for grant paid
09.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)29.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03]
Request for further processing for:21.11.2003Request for further processing filed
21.11.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.12.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.04.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4272342  (ODA KAZUTAKA, et al) [A] 1 * column 7 - column 8; claims 1-16 *;
 [A]JPS63268239  ;
 [A]EP0585586  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 7 - page 8; claims 1-4 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE3142488  (KLEIN KLAUS ING GRAD [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1 - page 2; claims 1-7 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 50, Database accession no. 1988-357310, XP002140989 & JPS63268239 A 19881104 (MATSUSHITA ELEC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *