Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033176

EP1033176 - Method and plant for the painting of wooden doors and windows or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CEFLA SOC. COOP. A R.L.
Via Selice Provinciale 23/A I-40026 Imola
Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
CEFLA SOC. COOP. A R.L.
Via Selice Provinciale 23/A
I-40026 Imola, Bologna / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Baroncini, Bruno
Via Pasquala 7
40026 Imola, Province of Bologna / IT
02 / Dovadola, Massimo
Via Fiumasso 16
48022 Lugo, Province of Ravenna / IT
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Porsia, Dino
c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber
Via Caffaro 3/2
16124 Genova / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Porsia, Dino, Dr.
c/o Succ. Ing. Fischetti & Weber Via Caffaro 3/2
16124 Genova / IT
Application number, filing date00104140.929.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateIT1999BO0009002.03.1999         Original published format: IT BO990090
[2000/36]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033176
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033176
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:B05B13/02, B05B15/12, B05C9/10, B27K3/02
[2003/01]
Former International [2000/36]B05B13/02, B05B15/12, B05C9/10
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/39]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anlage zum Beschichten von Türen oder Fenstern aus Holz oder dergleichen[2000/36]
English:Method and plant for the painting of wooden doors and windows or the like[2000/36]
French:Procédé et installation pour revêtir des portes et des fenêtres en bois ou objets similaires[2000/36]
Examination procedure03.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
10.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.08.2003M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]FR1151625  (PEIGNE CHARLES) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1, paragraph L - column 2, paragraph 1 * * figure - * [A] 2,5-26;
 [XA]DE19641524  (GRATZ ACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,26 * column 1, line 1 - line 20 * * column 1, paragraph L * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 45 * * figure - * [A] 5,8-25;
 [A]US4390564  (KIMBLE ALVIN J [US]) [A] 1-26 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2512696  (DIETRICH & CIE DE [FR]) [A] 1,5,8 * page 1, line 1 - line 16 * * page 6, line 12 - line 15 * * figure - *;
 [A]DD270476  (ORANIENBURG INFRAROT VEB [DD]) [A] 1,17,22 * abstract * * page 10 - page 11 * * figure - *;
 [A]FR2765133  (COURNARIE MICHEL [FR]) [A] 2,4,18 * abstract * * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 21 * * figure - *