Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043727

EP1043727 - Semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.01.2006  [2006/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd.
7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd.
7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uehara, Hidenori, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd.
7-12 Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Nasu, Nobutaka, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd.
7-12 Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Kirschner, Klaus Dieter
Puschmann Borchert Bardehle
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 10 12 31
80086 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys.
Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 38
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date00104156.529.02.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateJP1999010260509.04.1999         Original published format: JP 10260599
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043727
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043727
Date:11.07.2001
[2001/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1043727
Date:26.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:G11C5/14, G11C8/00
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/14]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halbleiteranordnung[2000/41]
English:Semiconductor device[2000/41]
French:Dispositif à semiconducteurs[2000/41]
Examination procedure09.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/13]
16.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2004Fee for grant paid
25.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5694355  (SKJAVELAND KARL [CA], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 42 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5544102  (TOBITA YOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, lines 26,27 * * figure 27 *