Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033397

EP1033397 - Steam conversion process for treating vacuum gas oil [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.2007
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intevep SA
Apartado 76343
Caracas 1070 A / VE
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Pereira, Pedro R.
Res. Las Salias, Paramo - 3C
San Antonio de Los Altos / VE
02 / Romero, Trino J.
Res. Mara - Apto. 3B
San Antonio de Los Altos / VE
03 / Velasquez, Jose, R.
Conj. Resd. Ramo Verde, Edif. Judith, Apto. B-52
Los Teques / VE
04 / Tusa, Alfonso L.
1 RA. Calle El Barbetto 36, El Tambor
Los Teques / VE
05 / Rojas, Iraima J.
Res. Los Helechos, Torre "A", Piso 12, Apart. 122
San Antonio de Los Altos / VE
06 / Camejo, William Y.
Urb. El. Trigo Sector La Mascota, Qta. Ardita
Los Teques / VE
07 / Rosa-Brussin, Marcos F. Res. Auracarolina
Apto. 3B, Calle Rio Torbes, Lomas Bello Monte
Caracas / VE
 [2007/32]
Former [2000/36]01 / Pereira, Pedro R.
Res. Las Salias, Paramo - 3C
San Antonio de Los Altos / VE
02 / Romero, Trino J.
Res. Mara - Apto. 3B
San Antonio de Los Altos / VE
03 / Velasquez, Jose, R.
Conj. Resd. Ramo Verde, Edif. Judith, Apto. B-52
Los Teques / VE
04 / Tusa, Alfonso L.
1 RA. Calle El Barbetto #36, El Tambor
Los Teques / VE
05 / Rojas, Iraima J.
Res. Los Helechos, Torre "A", Piso 12, Apart. 122
San Antonio de Los Altos / VE
06 / Camejo, William Y.
Urb. El. Trigo Sector La Mascota, Qta. Ardita
Los Teques / VE
07 / Rosa-Brussin, Marcos F. Res. Auracarolina
Apto. 3B, Calle Rio Torbes, Lomas Bello Monte
Caracas / VE
Representative(s)Hiebsch, Gerhard F. , et al
Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG)
78224 Singen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Hiebsch, Gerhard F. , et al
Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464
78204 Singen / DE
Former [2000/36]Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hiebsch Peege Behrmann, Patentanwälte, Heinrich-Weber-Platz 1
78224 Singen / DE
Application number, filing date00104186.229.02.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateUS1999026010802.03.1999         Original published format: US 260108
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033397
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033397
Date:13.12.2000
[2000/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033397
Date:13.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C10G11/02, C10G47/32, C10G51/02
[2000/50]
Former International [2000/36]C10G11/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/36]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dampfumwandlungsverfahren zur Behandlung von Vakuumgasöl[2000/36]
English:Steam conversion process for treating vacuum gas oil[2000/36]
French:Procédé de conversion à la vapeur d'eau pour le traitement de gazole sous vide[2000/36]
Examination procedure06.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/23]
14.06.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.10.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
29.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2006Date of oral proceedings
30.06.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2006Fee for grant paid
20.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0814145  (INTEVEP SA [VE]) [X] 1,2,5-14 * claims 1-4,10-18 * [Y] 3,4;
 [X]FR612327  (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG) [X] 1,2,5-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB642325  (ANGLO IRANIAN OIL CO LTD, et al) [Y] 3,4 * figure 1; claims 1-8; table I *;
 [A]EP0870815  (INTEVEP SA [VE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *