Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033630

EP1033630 - Developing apparatus for image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/36]Developing apparatus and image forming apparatus
[2007/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2010
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.04.2011  [2011/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2009/25]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishii, Yasuyuki
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Uehara, Shinji
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Kakeshita, Tomomi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/36]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/36]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00104229.001.03.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateJP1999005401802.03.1999         Original published format: JP 5401899
JP1999032232512.11.1999         Original published format: JP 32232599
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033630
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033630
Date:17.03.2004
[2004/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033630
Date:17.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/08
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2004/50]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Entwicklungsgerät für Bilderzeugungsgerät[2007/48]
English:Developing apparatus for image forming apparatus[2007/48]
French:Appareil de développement pour appareil de formation d'images[2007/48]
Former [2000/36]Entwicklungsgerät und Bilderzeugungsgerät
Former [2000/36]Developing apparatus and image forming apparatus
Former [2000/36]Appareil de développement et appareil de formation d'images
Examination procedure01.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
30.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2009Fee for grant paid
04.05.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT17.06.2009
[2011/14]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4624559  (HANEDA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11,15-17,19,20,22,23,25 * column 1, line 13 - column 14, line 11; figures 1,4,5 * [Y] 4,7,10,12-14,18,21,24,26,27;
 [Y]EP0791861  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 4,7,12-14,18,21,26,27 * page 4, line 7 - page 6, line 56 * * page 12, line 41 - page 13, line 2 * * page 25, line 38 - page 26, line 2; figures 1,2,13 *;
 [XAY]JPH1020632  ;
 [XAY]US5628043  (IKEDA MASAE [JP], et al) [X] 1,15 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 67; figures 2,5,6 * [A] 11,25 [Y] 12,26;
 [A]JPS5818657
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, [X] 1,15 * abstract * [A] 11,25 [Y] 10,24
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830419), vol. 007, no. 093, Database accession no. (P - 192), [A] 1-27 * abstract *
by applicantUS4624559
 JPS5818657
 EP0791861
 JPH1020632
 JPS3610231B
 JPS5953856