EP1045197 - Hang type lighting fixture for workstation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WILA Leuchten AG Bahnweg Nord 16 9475 Sevelen SG / CH | [2000/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Unger, Thomas Stennerstrasse 14 58636 Iserlohn / DE | 02 /
Henrich, Andreas Im Sonnenwinkel 14 58119 Hagen / DE | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Schröter & Haverkamp Patentanwälte Im Tückwinkel 22 58636 Iserlohn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/42] | Schröter & Haverkamp Patentanwälte Im Tückwinkel 22 58636 Iserlohn / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104314.0 | 02.03.2000 | [2000/42] | Priority number, date | DE1999117026 | 15.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19917026 | [2000/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1045197 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1045197 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/06, // F21W131:402 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
F21S8/06 (EP,US);
F21V7/0016 (EP);
F21W2131/402 (EP);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/42] | Title | German: | Arbeitsplatzbezogene Pendelleuchte | [2000/42] | English: | Hang type lighting fixture for workstation | [2000/42] | French: | Lampe suspendue pour poste de travail | [2000/42] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/16] | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0697560 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, lines 40-50 * * column 2, lines 18-28 * * column 3, lines 32-38 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 8 * * column 6, lines 39-43 * * column 8, line 45 - column 9, line 4 * * figures 1,8 *; | [X]GB2032606 (ESQUIRE INC) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US4300185 (WAKAMATSU JACK K) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 1, lines 43-48 * * column 3, lines 42-63 * * column 5, lines 3-11 * * figures 1-8 * | by applicant | DE3301277 | DE4143328 |