Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040919

EP1040919 - Signature collecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Cote, Kevin Lauren
26 Frost Drive
Durham, NH 03824 / US
02 / Hearn, Michael Lee
265 Washington St.
Dover, NH 03820 / US
03 / Ketchum, John Lee
31 W. Old Orchard Ave.
Old Orchard Beach, ME 04064 / US
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Duschl, Edgar Johannes
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG
Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Duschl, Edgar Johannes, Dr.
Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Application number, filing date00104331.402.03.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateUS1999027778929.03.1999         Original published format: US 277789
[2000/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1040919
Date:04.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1040919
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41F13/64, B65H39/10
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/25]
Former [2000/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Signatursammelvorrichtung[2000/40]
English:Signature collecting device[2000/40]
French:Dispositif collecteur pour signatures[2000/40]
Examination procedure19.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
25.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2002Fee for grant paid
29.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT04.09.2002
[2007/35]
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0210633  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * siehe Zusammenfassung; page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, line L; figures 1-3; claims 1,5-8 *;
 [Y]DE662478  (JAGENBERG WERKE AG) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 80; figures 1,2,5 *;
 [Y]DE721761  (RADEBEULER MASCHINENFABRIK AUG) [Y] 4,6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0169489  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 5 * siehe Zusammenfassung; page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 29; figures 1,5-7 *;
 [A]US4354671  (BERGLAND PAUL W) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE3527710  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4746107  (SCHNEIDER ECKHARD [DE], et al) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *