Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034890

EP1034890 - Method and device for blasting with different types of blasting medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2002
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.07.2002  [2002/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Linde Gas Aktiengesellschaft
Seitnerstrasse 70
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
Linde Gas AG
Seitnerstrasse 70
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Linde Technische Gase GmbH
Seitnerstrasse 70
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jean-Pierre Serex
Rue du la chene 30
CH-1315 La Sarraz / CH
02 / Joseph Saxer Ing.HTL
Sonnhalde 15a
CH-6206 Neuenkirch / CH
03 / Reiner Schiffbauer Dipl.-Ing(FH)
Brunnmattstrasse 12
CH-6048 Horw / CH
04 / Alexander Buinger Dipl.-Phys.
August-Macke-Weg 8
D-81477 München / DE
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Obermüller, Bernhard
Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Obermüller, Bernhard
Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung
82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Application number, filing date00104375.102.03.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateDE199910971805.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19909718
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1034890
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1034890
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B24C1/00, B24C7/00
[2000/37]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/36]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bestrahlen mit verschiedenartigen Strahlmitteln[2000/37]
English:Method and device for blasting with different types of blasting medium[2000/37]
French:Procédé et dispositif de grenaillage avec différents types de grenailles[2000/37]
Examination procedure21.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/27]
07.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.09.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.09.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
20.09.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19601814  (KIPP JENS WERNER [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,9,13 * figure -; claim 5 * [Y] 3,6,7,11,12;
 [YA]DE19603141  (CHRZASZCZAK JERZY [DE], et al) [Y] 3 * column 2, line 9 - line 29 * [A] 1,2,8,9,13;
 [YA]US5664992  (WILLIAMS JR ROBERT V [US]) [Y] 6,7,11,12 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 13; figure - * [A] 1,8,9,13;
 [A]WO9858768  (GEVI GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,8,9 * page 9, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]DE3617692  (FERTL KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 3; figure - *