EP1039329 - Liquid crystal composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshioka, Yasue Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc., 6-1-1, Niijuku Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 02 /
Johno, Masahiro Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc., 6-1-1, Niijuku Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 03 /
Yui, Tomoyuki Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc., 6-1-1, Niijuku Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | 04 /
Matsumoto, Takahiro Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc., 6-1-1, Niijuku Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125-0051 / JP | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus, Weisert & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00104501.2 | 10.03.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | JP19990064909 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6490999 | JP19990070885 | 16.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7088599 | JP19990213645 | 28.07.1999 Original published format: JP 21364599 | JP19990372772 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37277299 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1039329 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1039329 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | [2001/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/94, C09K19/20 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
C09K19/0266 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/2007 (KR);
C09K19/2021 (EP,US);
G02F1/141 (KR);
C09K2019/2042 (KR);
C09K2323/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/39] | G02F1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/01] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkristall-Mischung | [2000/41] | English: | Liquid crystal composition | [2000/39] | French: | Composition à cristal liquides | [2000/41] |
Former [2000/39] | Flüssigkristallmischung | ||
Former [2000/39] | Composition à cristaux liquides | Examination procedure | 22.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 10.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 02.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0829468 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-11; | [Y]EP0853076 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-11; | [A]EP0893429 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-11; | [A]EP0829526 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-11; | [A]EP0780456 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-11; | [A]EP0737733 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN [AD] 1-11 |