Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035735

EP1035735 - Moving image coding and decoding apparatus optimised for the application of the Real Time Protocol (RTP) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.12.2008
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72 Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72 Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kikuchi, Yoshihiro
604 Kureare Toshiba Yoshinocho, 1-10-1 Takasagocho
Minami-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Masuda, Tadaaki
3-17-17-112, Heiwadai
Nerima-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Nagai, Takeshi
301 City Haitsu Hasegawa, 2-218 Tsukagoshi
Saiwai-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00104524.410.03.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateJP1999006712012.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6712099
JP1999025192906.09.1999         Original published format: JP 25192999
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035735
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035735
Date:05.09.2007
[2007/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2008/20]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bewegtbildkoder und -dekoder optimiert für die Echtzeitprotokollanwendung (RTP)[2000/37]
English:Moving image coding and decoding apparatus optimised for the application of the Real Time Protocol (RTP)[2000/37]
French:Codeur et décodeur d'images animées optimisés pour la mise en oeuvre du protocole temps réel (RTP)[2000/37]
Examination procedure21.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/06]
06.03.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.04.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
28.11.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]  K.IMURA, Y.MACHIDA, "The results of core experiment E3b (HEC)", ISO/IEC JTC1/WG11, (199702), no. m1635, pages 1 - 7, XP002443369 [X] 1-6,10-36,40,41,43-47 * page 1 - page 2 *
 [X]  K. IMURA, Y. MACHIDA, T. WATANABE, Y.KIKUCHI, T. MIKI, T.OHYA, S.ADACHI, "The framework of the core experiment E3b", ISO/IEC JTC/WG11, (199611), no. m1405, pages 1 - 2, XP002443370 [X] 1-6,10-36,40,41,43-47 * the whole document *
 [X]  C. HERPEL & AL, "RTP payload format for MPEG-4 Elementary Streams", ISO/IEC JTC1/WG11, (199801), no. m3083, pages 1 - 12, XP002443371 [X] 7-9,37-39,42 * page 4, paragraph 2.1 - page 5 * * page 6 *
 [A]  G. FERNANDO, M. SPEER, "information to MUX/DMIF group of MPEG4 systems", ISO/IEC JTC1/WG11, (199707), no. m2456, pages 1 - 2, XP002443372 [A] 1-47 * the whole document *