Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037261

EP1037261 - Etching and cleaning method and etching and cleaning apparatus used therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/38]Etching and cleaning methods and etching and cleaning apparatuses used therefor
[2005/49]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
[2006/20]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamasaki, Shinya
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Aoki, Hidemitsu
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Baronetzky, Klaus
Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00104585.514.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateJP1999006889815.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6889899
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037261
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037261
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037261
Date:17.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/00, H01L21/3213
[2002/45]
Former International [2000/38]H01L21/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/30]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Ätzen und Reinigen und Vorrichtung dafür[2005/49]
English:Etching and cleaning method and etching and cleaning apparatus used therefor[2005/49]
French:Procédé de gravure et de nettoyage et appareillage[2005/49]
Former [2000/38]Verfahren Zur Ätzung und Reinigung und Vorrichtungen dafür
Former [2000/38]Etching and cleaning methods and etching and cleaning apparatuses used therefor
Former [2000/38]Procédés de gravure et de nettoyage et appareillages
Examination procedure26.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
30.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2006Fee for grant paid
11.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
20.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT17.05.2006
[2007/35]
Documents cited:Search[X]US5032217  (TANAKA MASATO [JP]) [X] 1,14,27,40 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0368334  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,14,27,40 * abstract * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 36 *;
 [PX]EP0924754  (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [PX] 1-49 * the whole document *;
 [PX]WO9946064  (SEMITOOL INC [US], et al) [PX] 1,14,27,40 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4109955  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-49 * the whole document *