Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044660

EP1044660 - Device for producing mechanical vibrations of high frequency for a dental handpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.04.2008
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dürr Dental GmbH & Co. KG
Höpfigheimer Strasse 17
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
For all designated states
Hahn, Rainer, Dr.
Schwabstrasse 11
72074 Tübingen / DE
[2000/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Hahn, Rainer, Dr.
Schwabstrasse 11
72074 Tübingen / DE
02 / Grotz, Uwe
Marienstrasse 5
74369 Löchgau / DE
 [2007/04]
Former [2000/42]01 / Hahn, Rainer
Schwabstrasse 11
72074 Tübingen / DE
02 / Grotz, Uwe
Marienstrasse 5
74369 Löchgau / DE
Representative(s)Ostertag, Reinhard
Ostertag & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Epplestrasse 14
70597 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Ostertag, Reinhard
Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date00104606.903.03.2000
[2000/42]
Priority number, dateDE199911616111.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19916161
[2000/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1044660
Date:18.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1044660
Date:18.12.2002
[2002/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1044660
Date:06.06.2007
Language:DE
[2007/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61C17/20, A61C1/07, A61C1/00, B06B1/02, B06B1/06
[2002/42]
Former International [2000/42]A61C17/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   LI [2003/37]
Former [2000/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur Erzeugung vorzugsweise hochfrequenter mechanischer Schwingungen für ein dentales Handstück[2000/42]
English:Device for producing mechanical vibrations of high frequency for a dental handpiece[2000/42]
French:Dispositif destiné à la formation de vibrations mécaniques à haute fréquence pour une pièce à main dentaire[2000/42]
Examination procedure19.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/29]
24.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2007Fee for grant paid
23.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
21.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.03.2008
[2009/40]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4184092  (WIESER ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, lines 62-68 * * column 3, lines 10-13,53 - column 4, line 51; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,4;
 [YA]US4371816  (WIESER ALFRED [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 4, lines 1-9,48 - column 5, line 3; figures 1-3 * [A] 1;
 [Y]US4689515  (BENNDORF GERALD [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, lines 29,39-43; figures 3-44 *