Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039530

EP1039530 - Method for manufacturing semiconductor device capable of avoiding flaws and erosion caused by metal chemical-mechanical polishing process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 20.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.05.2002  [2002/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takaharu, Kunugi, c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date00104654.903.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateJP1999005794705.03.1999         Original published format: JP 5794799
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039530
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039530
Date:25.10.2000
[2000/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP12.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/768
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/29]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halbleiterbauelement-Herstellungsverfahren zur Vermeidung von Fehlern und Erosion auf Grund von chemisch-mechanischem Polieren von Metall[2000/39]
English:Method for manufacturing semiconductor device capable of avoiding flaws and erosion caused by metal chemical-mechanical polishing process[2000/39]
French:Méthode de fabrication d'un dispositif semiconducteur évitant les défauts et l'érosion résultants du procédé de polissage mécano-chimique d'un métal[2000/39]
Examination procedure04.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
27.02.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/18]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5371047  (GRECO STEPHEN E [US], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 27; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]US5777370  (OMID-ZOHOOR FARROKH KIA [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 6, lines 1-57 *;
 [A]US5225034  (YU CHRIS C [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *;
 [XY]US5776833  (CHEN HSI-CHIEH [TW], et al) [X] 21,26 * column 1, line 5 - column 4, line 43; figures 3A-3E * [Y] 22-25,27,28;
 [X]EP0848419  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 21,26 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5614765  (AVANZINO STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 22-25 * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]JPS63128648  ;
 [Y]JPH0312927
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881014), vol. 012, no. 385, Database accession no. (E - 668), [Y] 27 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910327), vol. 015, no. 125, Database accession no. (E - 1050), [Y] 28 * abstract *