Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035268

EP1035268 - Motor-driven staircase [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gao, Ming, Dr.
Kurt-Tucholsky-Ring 90
38239 Salzgitter / DE
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/37]
Application number, filing date00104744.804.03.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateDE199911080611.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19910806
DE199915259702.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19952597
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035268
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035268
Date:05.09.2001
[2001/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035268
Date:26.07.2006
Language:DE
[2006/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:E04F11/06
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:Motorangetriebene Treppen[2000/37]
English:Motor-driven staircase[2000/37]
French:Escalier à moteur[2000/37]
Examination procedure28.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/23]
18.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2006Fee for grant paid
17.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
FR26.07.2006
GB26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
LU04.03.2007
BE31.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2009/01]FI26.07.2006
FR26.07.2006
GB26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
BE31.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/19]FI26.07.2006
GB26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
BE31.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/09]FI26.07.2006
GB26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
BE31.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
Former [2008/04]FI26.07.2006
GB26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
BE31.03.2007
Former [2007/35]FI26.07.2006
GB26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/28]FI26.07.2006
GB26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/25]FI26.07.2006
IE26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/22]FI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/19]FI26.07.2006
NL26.07.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/12]FI26.07.2006
SE26.10.2006
ES06.11.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/09]FI26.07.2006
SE26.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH05256078  ;
 [DA]DE9214710U  (HENKE GMBH & CO TREPPEWERKE) [DA] 1,3-5 * page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 23; figures 1-4 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940112), vol. 018, no. 016, Database accession no. (M - 1540), [A] 1,4-6 * abstract *
by applicantDE2458788
 DE1509491
 DE1905220
 DE9214710U
 DE4325366