Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035650

EP1035650 - A remotely controlled electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.07.2006  [2006/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Rychlak, Stefan
Zum Busch 12
31241 Ilsede / DE
[2000/37]
Application number, filing date00104779.406.03.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateDE199910965605.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19909656
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035650
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035650
Date:23.04.2003
[2003/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035650
Date:27.07.2005
Language:DE
[2005/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H03J9/06
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/03]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ferngesteuertes elektronisches Gerät[2000/37]
English:A remotely controlled electronic apparatus[2000/37]
French:Appareil électronique commandé à distance[2000/37]
Examination procedure23.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/01]
17.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2005Fee for grant paid
27.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4633514  (FIMOFF MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 3; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE4323204  (OFFERGELD MARKUS [DE])