Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033576

EP1033576 - Method of preparing sample for amino acid analysis and kit for analyzing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phenomenex, Inc.
2320 West 5th Street
Torrance, CA 90501 / US
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Husek, Petr
4 Nada pruhy
Praha 4, 147 00 Czech Republic / CZ
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Schmitz, Hans-Werner
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Schmitz, Hans-Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date00104786.906.03.2000
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateCZ1999000077004.03.1999         Original published format: CZ 77099
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033576
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033576
Date:10.04.2002
[2002/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2000/36]
Designated contracting states[2003/01]
Former [2000/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Vorbereitung einer Probe für Aminosäureanalyse und Testsatz dazu[2000/36]
English:Method of preparing sample for amino acid analysis and kit for analyzing the same[2000/36]
French:Méthode pour la préparation d'un échantillon pour l'analyse d'acides aminés et trousse de réactifs pour la même[2000/36]
Examination procedure01.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/18]
15.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/18]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.11.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.11.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3686118  (BENSON JAMES R) [Y] 1-32 * column 3, line 69 - line 75; claims 1-11 *;
 [Y]DE3717211  (DIAGEN INST MOLEKULARBIO [DE]) [Y] 13-17,22-26 * claims 1-14 *;
 [X]  HUSEK P, "Chloroformates in gas chromatography as general purpose derivatizing agents", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (19981009), vol. 717, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 57 - 91, XP004141363 [X] 1,2,6-9,18-21,30 * page 81, l. col., bottom paragraph * * pages 79 et seq., chapter 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(98)00136-4
 [X]  PIETZSCH JENS ET AL, "Rapid determination of total homocysteine in human plasma by using N(O,S)-ethoxycarbonyl ethyl ester derivatives and gas chromatography-mass spectrometry.", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 43, no. 10, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 2001 - 2004, XP002185512 [X] 1-4,6-9,18-21,30 * the whole document *
 [Y]  HUSEK P ET AL, "Simple approach for analysis of plasma oxo-, hydroxy- and dicarboxylic acids", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (19970606), vol. 693, no. 2, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 499 - 502, XP004125731 [Y] 1-32 * "Experimental" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(97)00026-1
 [A]  HUSEK P, "AMINO ACID DERIVATIZATION AND ANALYSIS IN FIVE MINUTES", FEBS (FEDERATION OF EUROPEAN BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETIES) LETTERS, (1991), vol. 280, no. 2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 354 - 356, XP001037025

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(91)80330-6