Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037462

EP1037462 - Amplitude control for broadcast data receiving systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pace Micro Technology Plc
Victoria Road Saltaire
Shipley BD14 3LF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/09]For all designated states
Pace Micro Technology PLC
Victoria Road Saltaire
Shipley, BD14 3LF / GB
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Pace Micro Technology PLC
Victoria Road
Saltaire, Shipley, BD14 3LF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Coe, Peter
1A Carleton Avenue
Skipton, North Yorkshire BD23 2TE / GB
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Wood, Graham
Bailey Walsh & Co LLP
1 York Place
Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Wood, Graham
Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place
Leeds LS1 2SD / GB
Application number, filing date00104937.808.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateGB1999000583615.03.1999         Original published format: GB 9905836
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037462
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037462
Date:02.05.2003
[2003/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037462
Date:01.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/16, H04N5/52, H04N17/00
[2003/18]
Former International [2000/38]H04N5/52, H04N17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
TitleGerman:Amplitudensteuerung für Rundfunkdatenempfangssysteme[2000/38]
English:Amplitude control for broadcast data receiving systems[2000/38]
French:Contrôle d'amplitude pour des systèmes de réception de données diffusées[2000/38]
Examination procedure31.10.2003Examination requested  [2004/01]
26.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2005Fee for grant paid
02.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
CY01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
IE08.03.2006
LU08.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
GR02.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]AT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
IE08.03.2006
LU08.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
GR02.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2008/19]AT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
IE08.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
GR02.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2007/45]AT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
IE08.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2007/35]AT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
IT01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
IE08.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2007/13]AT01.03.2006
BE01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
IE08.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2007/12]AT01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
IE08.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2007/09]AT01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
PT01.08.2006
Former [2007/08]AT01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
DK01.06.2006
SE01.06.2006
Former [2006/45]AT01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
NL01.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
SE01.06.2006
Former [2006/43]AT01.03.2006
CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
Former [2006/42]CH01.03.2006
FI01.03.2006
LI01.03.2006
Former [2006/36]FI01.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US4864613  (VAN CLEAVE JAMES [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 50 - column 6, line 38; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5640688  (RUITENBURG LEO [DE]);
 [A]US4969050  (MAIER GERHARD [DE], et al);
 [A]GB2314983  (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP])