Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035280

EP1035280 - Lock for a door of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.05.2006  [2006/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTIER AUTOMOTIVE CLOSURES S.p.A
Corso Allamano 70/5
10090 Cascine Vica-Rivoli (To) / IT
[2002/18]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
ATOMA ROLTRA S.p.A.
Zona Industriale, Via Camerelle
86077 Pozzilli (IS) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Taurasi, Marco
Via Lombardia, 7
57124 Livorno / IT
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Franzolin, Luigi , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Franzolin, Luigi , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date00104972.509.03.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateIT1999TO0019512.03.1999         Original published format: IT TO990195
[2000/37]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035280
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035280
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:E05B47/00, E05B65/20, E05B65/12
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/22]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schloss für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür[2000/37]
English:Lock for a door of a motor vehicle[2000/37]
French:Serrure pour porte de véhicule automobile[2000/37]
Examination procedure05.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
27.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2005Fee for grant paid
17.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES12.09.2005
[2006/14]
Documents cited:Search[XAY]DE19545722  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 4 - line 39; figure 2 * * column 5, line 65 - column 7, line 26; figure 4 * [A] 12 [Y] 3;
 [YA]GB2320943  (CHEVALIER JOHN PHILLIP [GB]) [Y] 3 * page 25, line 17 - page 27, line 9; figures 15,16 * * page 29, line 22 - page 30, line 9; figure 18A * [A] 1,2;
 [XA]DE19600524  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 22; figures 3A-3F * [A] 4,12;
 [XA]DE3414475  (KIEKERT GMBH CO KG) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [XA]DE9012785U  (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [X] 1 * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 * * page 11, paragraph 3; figures 6,7 * [A] 2;
 [A]EP0430732  (VACHETTE SA [FR]) [A] 4 * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2284635  (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) [A] 12 * page 6, line 12 - page 8, line 2; figures 1,2 *