Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048448

EP1048448 - Hydromechanical press drive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2006
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Müller Weingarten AG
Schussenstrasse 11
88250 Weingarten / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Müller Weingarten AG
Schussenstrasse 11
D-88250 Weingarten / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Harsch, Erich
Hirschstrasse 12
88250 Weingarten / DE
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte
Grosstobeler Strasse 39
88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler
Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Former [2000/44]Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler
Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Application number, filing date00104996.409.03.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateDE199911870026.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19918700
[2000/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1048448
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP1048448
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1048448
Date:23.01.2002
[2002/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048448
Date:08.02.2006
Language:DE
[2006/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:B30B1/10, B30B1/16
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2002/41]
Former [2000/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hydromechanischer Pressenantrieb[2000/44]
English:Hydromechanical press drive[2000/44]
French:Entraînement de presse hydromécanique[2000/44]
Examination procedure29.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/27]
08.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2005Fee for grant paid
06.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/35]IT08.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US4920782  (HELLWIG WALDEMAR [CH]) [X] 1-9,12 * column 1, line 1 - line 8 * * column 4, line 44 - line 66 * * column 8, line 37 - line 62 * * column 10, line 20 - line 28; figures 3,4; claims 1,5,8 *;
 [X]DE19649063  (HOERNER BERND DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,12 * column 1, line 1 - line 22 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 14; figure 1 *;
 [X]FR1575618  (BERTHOLLET, FRANCE) [X] 1,10,11 * page 1, paragraph 1; figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [X]DE3643502  (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 * * column 3, line 65 - line 68; figure 2 *;
 [A]US3623389  (KRYNYTZKY ALEXANDER, et al) [A] 6,8,12 * column 1, line 1 - line 25 * * column 1, line 48 - line 50 * * column 2, line 71 - column 3, line 11; figure 1 *