Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035730

EP1035730 - Multibeam scanning optical apparatus and color image-forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.06.2009
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2008/33]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kato, Manabu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Weser, Wolfgang
Weser & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Weser, Wolfgang
Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date00105049.109.03.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateJP1999006653612.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6653699
JP2000006339908.03.2000         Original published format: JP 2000063399
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035730
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035730
Date:01.10.2003
[2003/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035730
Date:13.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/50
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/26]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optisches Abtastgerät mit mehreren Strahlen und Gerät zur Erzeugung von Farbbildern[2000/37]
English:Multibeam scanning optical apparatus and color image-forming apparatus[2000/37]
French:Appareil optique de balayage à plusieurs faisceaux et appareil de formation d'images en couleurs[2000/37]
Examination procedure20.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/17]
28.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.06.2008Fee for grant paid
30.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04028760.9  / EP1517539
Opposition(s)14.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19817591  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 20 - line 49 * * page 6, line 3 - line 14 * * page 10, line 7 - line 48 * [Y] 12;
 US6031561  [ ] (NARAYAN BADHRI [US], et al);
 [Y]EP0898415  (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0092] *;
 [A]US4862196  (UMEDA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, line 28 - column 9, line 52 *;
 [A]US5872586  (SHIO YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 12 * column 3 * * column 8, line 63 - column 9, line 19; figures 10,12,16 *
ExaminationEP0566132
 EP0735742