Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035743

EP1035743 - Communication unit position detecting system and recording medium storing the position detecting program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.01.2007  [2007/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/07]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka / JP
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakao, Atsushi
3744-1-401, Nimyouhigashimachi
Nara-shi, Narka-ken / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date00105050.909.03.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateJP1999006525411.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6525499
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035743
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035743
Date:25.07.2001
[2001/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035743
Date:15.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38, G08B25/00
[2001/19]
Former International [2000/37]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/16]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zur Bestimmung der Position einer Kommunikationseinheit und Speichermedium zur Speicherung des Positionierungsprogramm[2000/37]
English:Communication unit position detecting system and recording medium storing the position detecting program[2000/37]
French:Système pour la détection de la position d'une unitée de communication et support d'enregistrement du programme de positionnement[2000/37]
Examination procedure04.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
07.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
26.01.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.07.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
08.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2005Fee for grant paid
07.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.04.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2299431  (HIBBITT PETER [GB]) [X] 1-4,11 * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *;
 [X]GB2223869  (TUNSTALL TELECOM LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,11 * page 7, line 2 - line 10 * * page 8, line 3 - line 10 * * page 2, line 4 - line 9 *;
 [XY]DE19616576  (EBKE KLAUS PETER [DE]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 10;
 [Y]FR2229981  (CAMION JEAN [FR]) [Y] 10 * page 1, line 1 - line 2 * * page 2, line 25 - line 27 *;
 [XY]US4173016  (DICKSON CARLISLE H [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 61 - column 4, line 55 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]US5642095  (COOK RUSSEL P [US]) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 51 - line 57 *;
 [X]DE19726863  (HEBLER ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,11 * column 2, line 51 - line 53 * * column 3, line 1 - line 25 *;
 [PX]EP0919968  (OLSSON ROLF [DE]) [PX] 1,2,11 * column 1, line 40 - column 3, line 37 *;
 [X]FR2615957  (DUPUCH CHARLES [FR]) [X] 1,2,11 * page 2, line 7 - line 11 *;
 [X]EP0347491  (RG ELECTRONIC [DE]) [X] 1,2,11 * column 2, line 9 - line 24 *;
 [X]DE19502627  (WOLSCHKE PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4411488  (KRIEG WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 5 * column 3, line 27 *;
 [A]EP0508939  (GOMES DOS SANTOS ALCINO [PT]) [A] 5,6,8 * abstract *;
 [X]FR2585846  (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) [X] 1,2,11 * page 3, line 23 - line 25 *;
 [A]US4045799  (DAPIRAN FULVIO) [A] 10 * abstract *;
 [A]US5109789  (BERMAN ODED [IL])