Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038453

EP1038453 - Device for transferring filter rods containing powdery or granulated particles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hauni Maschinenbau AG
Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32
21033 Hamburg / DE
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Hans-Herbert
Fabricius Strasse 290
22177 Hamburg / DE
[2000/39]
Application number, filing date00105163.011.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateDE199911342225.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19913422
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1038453
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038453
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:A24C5/32
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zum Überführen von pulver- oder granulatförmige Artikel enthaltenden Filterstäben[2000/39]
English:Device for transferring filter rods containing powdery or granulated particles[2000/39]
French:Dispositif pour transférer des tiges de filtre contenant des particules sous forme de poudre ou de granulé[2000/39]
Examination procedure10.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
30.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.02.2003Fee for grant paid
28.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.06.2003
FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
AT11.03.2004
LU11.03.2004
[2007/08]
Former [2005/51]FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
AT11.03.2004
LU11.03.2004
Former [2005/23]FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
LU11.03.2004
Former [2004/29]FI25.06.2003
IE25.06.2003
DK25.09.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
Former [2004/13]FI25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
PT25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
Former [2004/10]FI25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
SE25.09.2003
Former [2004/05]FI25.06.2003
GR25.09.2003
Former [2004/02]GR25.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5556236  (SEIM II ALBERT D [US], et al) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 14; figures 5,6 *;
 [AD]GB1410473  (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [AD] 1 * page 2, line 13 - line 19; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP0699396  (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 4 - line 13; figure 2; claim 14 *
by applicantUS5556236
 GB1410473