Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039042

EP1039042 - Coupling of a water-metre to a water conduit box [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Armaturenfabrik Wallisellen AG
Richtistrasse 2
CH-8304 Wallisellen / CH
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Egli, Werner, Dipl.Ing. ETH
Bergstrasse 9
8194 Hüntwangen / CH
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Wolff, Michael
Patentanwalt
Kirchheimer Strasse 69
Sillenbuch
70619 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Wolff, Michael, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwalt Kirchheimer Strasse 69 Sillenbuch
70619 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date00105175.411.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateDE1999205097U19.03.1999         Original published format: DE 29905097 U
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039042
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039042
Date:17.04.2002
[2002/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039042
Date:16.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:E03B7/07
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   IT,   LI [2003/02]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anschluss eines Wasserzählers an ein Wasserleitungsgehäuse[2000/39]
English:Coupling of a water-metre to a water conduit box[2000/39]
French:Raccord pour compteur d'eau à un boîtier pour conduite d'eau[2000/39]
Examination procedure07.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
11.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2003Fee for grant paid
17.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200405   M06   Fee paid on   16.04.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0327972  (GLYNWED TUBES & FITTINGS) [X] 1-7 * column 8, line 4 - column 10, line 28; figures 7-9 *;
 [X]EP0344777  (STEGMEIER KARL) [X] 1,4 * column 1, line 24 - line 47; figure - *;
 [X]DE3242763  (SAMECO ING J SCHACHE GMBH HAUS) [X] 1,4 * page 5, line 33 - line 38; figure - *;
 [DPA]DE19816322  (WALLISELLEN AG ARMATUREN) [DPA] 1-5 * figure 2 *
by applicantDE29806644U
 DE19816322