EP1047288 - Plasma focus high energy photon source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cymer, Inc. 17075 Thornmint Court San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2004/14] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Cymer, Inc. 16750 Via del Campo Court San Diego, CA 92127-1712 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Partlo, William N. 12634 Pedriza Drive Poway, CA 92064 / US | 02 /
Fomenkov, Igor V. 14390 Janal Way San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
Birx, Daniel L. 3300 Crismore Lane, Route 2, 175 D Oakley, CA 94561 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00105276.0 | 14.03.2000 | [2000/43] | Priority number, date | US19990268243 | 15.03.1999 Original published format: US 268243 | US19990324526 | 02.06.1999 Original published format: US 324526 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1047288 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1047288 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1047288 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05G2/00 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
B25J19/00 (KR);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/70033 (EP,US);
G03F7/70166 (EP,US);
G03F7/70916 (EP,US);
G06F3/16 (KR);
G10L13/08 (KR);
H05G2/003 (EP,US);
H05G2/005 (EP,US);
H05H1/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | Plasmaquelle von Hochenergie-Photonen | [2000/43] | English: | Plasma focus high energy photon source | [2000/43] | French: | Source à plasma de photons de haute énergie | [2000/43] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.2009 | BE | 10.06.2009 | CY | 10.06.2009 | DK | 10.06.2009 | FI | 10.06.2009 | IT | 10.06.2009 | SE | 10.09.2009 | GR | 11.09.2009 | ES | 21.09.2009 | PT | 10.10.2009 | [2012/37] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
IT | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5763930 (PARTLO WILLIAM NORMAN [US]) [X] 1,12-16,18,19,21 * the whole document * [Y] 6,25,31-33,35-37; | [DYA]US5504795 (MCGEOCH MALCOLM W [US]) [DY] 6,25 * column 2, line 56 - line 59 * * column 3, line 25 - line 35 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 36 * * figure 1 * [A] 28; | [YA]US5499282 (SILFVAST WILLIAM T [US]) [Y] 31-33,35-37 * column 9, line 31 - column 11, line 11 * * figures 9a-9c * [A] 4,5,7-9,12; | [A]US4578805 (PEARLMAN JAY S [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * column 2, line 14 - line 19 * * column 3, line 29 - line 50 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US3426233 (SIMON DONALD R, et al) [A] 26 * column 1, line 14 - line 24 * * column 5, line 70 - column 6, line 37 *; | [A]EP0539149 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [A] 29 * column 1, line 1 - line 26 *; | [A]JPH10189537 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10189537 A 19980721 (SONY CORP) [A] 20 * abstract * |