Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055577

EP1055577 - Roll control device of vehicle with failsafe function in case of sudden failure of rolling condition detection means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Noritaka, c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K.
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
02 / Nagae, Akira, c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K.
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date00105297.614.03.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateJP1999014597626.05.1999         Original published format: JP 14597699
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055577
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055577
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/88
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/33]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wankregelungssystem für ein Kraftfahrzeug mit Notbetrieb beim Ausfall der Wankbewegungserfassungseinrichtung[2000/48]
English:Roll control device of vehicle with failsafe function in case of sudden failure of rolling condition detection means[2000/48]
French:Système de réglage à sûreté intégrée de roulis pour un véhicule automobile en cas de défaillance du capteur de roulis[2000/48]
Examination procedure10.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
20.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2004Fee for grant paid
06.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XAY]DE19747144  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1,8 * column 15, line 2 - column 16, line 36 * * claims 6-9 * [A] 2,4,9 [Y] 10;
 [Y]US5707119  (MONZAKI SHIROU [JP]) [Y] 10 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19638280  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 11 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 9 *