Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037414

EP1037414 - Optical transmission circuit controlling input voltage amplitude of optical transmission circuit drive stage according to pulse current [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobayashi, Ippei
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/38]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00105314.916.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateJP1999007271017.03.1999         Original published format: JP 7271099
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037414
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/155
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Optische Übertragungsschaltung zur Steuerung der Eingangsspannungsamplitude der Steuerschaltung in Abhängigheit des Pulsstroms[2000/38]
English:Optical transmission circuit controlling input voltage amplitude of optical transmission circuit drive stage according to pulse current[2000/38]
French:Circuit de transmission optique controllant l'amplitude de la tension d'entrée du circuit de commande en fonction du courant impulsionnel[2000/38]
Examination procedure16.12.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03