Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037366

EP1037366 - Charge pump circuit having switching circuits for reducing leakage currents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/19]For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hasegawa, Atsushi
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Betten & Resch
Reichenbachstrasse 19
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date00105423.815.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateJP1999006888115.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6888199
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037366
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037366
Date:05.12.2001
[2001/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037366
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/00
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2002/35]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ladungspumpenschaltkreis mit Schaltung zur Verringerung von Leckströmen[2000/38]
English:Charge pump circuit having switching circuits for reducing leakage currents[2000/38]
French:Circuit de pompe de charge avec un circuit pour réduire des courants de fuite[2000/38]
Examination procedure20.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/22]
05.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2003Fee for grant paid
14.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5703511  (OKAMOTO MASAAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 4 * * column 6, line 43 - line 45 * * column 6, line 49 - line 51 * * column 6, line 62 - line 64 * * figures 5-7,9,10,12,18 *