Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036991

EP1036991 - Mounting device for underfloor heating tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fritzenwenger, Stefan
Miesenbacher Strasse 66
83324 Ruhpolding / DE
[2000/38]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/38]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/17]
Former [2000/38]Bauer, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Andrae Flach Haug Prinzregentenstrasse 24
83022 Rosenheim / DE
Application number, filing date00105544.116.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateDE1999205001U18.03.1999         Original published format: DE 29905001 U
[2000/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1036991
Date:20.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1036991
Date:10.07.2002
[2002/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:F24D3/14
[2000/38]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/37]
Former [2003/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  LI 
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fixiervorrichtung für Fussbodenheizungsrohre[2000/38]
English:Mounting device for underfloor heating tubes[2000/38]
French:Dispositif de fixation pour tubes de chauffage par le sol[2000/38]
Examination procedure15.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
17.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.07.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3108573  (RISSE ERNST [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure - *;
 [X]DE8701179U  (KRUMREY) [X] 1,2 * figure - *