Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048782

EP1048782 - Soft roll and process for making such a roll [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2001/33]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sohl, Carsten
Trelde Naesvey 91
7000 Fredericia / DK
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/44]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date00105584.716.03.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateDE199911956929.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19919569
[2000/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1048782
Date:02.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048782
Date:10.12.2003
Language:DE
[2003/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:D21G1/02
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/29]
Former [2000/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elastische Walze und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer solchen[2000/44]
English:Soft roll and process for making such a roll[2000/44]
French:Rouleau élastique et procédé pour la fabrication d' un tel rouleau[2000/44]
Examination procedure08.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
12.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2003Fee for grant paid
09.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0146342  (KERN RUBBER [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6,8-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5142759  (BONANDER JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6,10-12 * column W *;
 [A]US3395636  (HESS RALPH A) [A] 1,4,10 * column W *
ExaminationUS3673025
 WO9854405