Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036790

EP1036790 - Perfluoro group-containing compounds and hardened polymer of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.05.2006  [2006/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyoeisha Chemical Co., Ltd.
San Marion Osaka Bldg., 6-12 Minami, Honmachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Kyoeisha Chemical Co., Ltd.
San Marion Osaka Bldg., 6-12 Minami, Honmachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ikeda, Junichi
2-5 Saikujyo-cho, 5-chome
Nara-shi, Nara 630-8453 / JP
02 / Kawa, Hijimu
10601 Tweedsmuir Drive
Austin, TX 78750-3480 / US
[2000/38]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/14]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/38]Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00105587.016.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateJP1999007271917.03.1999         Original published format: JP 7271999
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036790
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036790
Date:01.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D303/26, C07D303/24, C07D303/22, C07C69/653, C08G59/40, C08G59/30, C08F124/00
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2001/23]
Former [2000/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Perfluoro-Gruppe enthaltende Verbindungen und gehärtetes Polymer aus diesen[2005/21]
English:Perfluoro group-containing compounds and hardened polymer of the same[2000/38]
French:Composés qui contiennent les groupes perfluorés et les polymères endurcis qui leurs contiennent[2000/38]
Former [2000/38]Perfluoro-Gruppe enthaltende Verbindungen und ihre enthaltende gehärtete Polymer
Examination procedure20.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
07.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2005Fee for grant paid
04.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2939550  (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1,5 * page 10, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 2; claims 9,10 *;
 [X]US4818801  (RICE DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 11, compound XXIV; column 15, lines 13-61; column 17, lines 28-47 *;
 [X]EP0599023  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1 * example 16 *;
 [X]DE19541788  (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 21 - line 35; example 4; claim - *;
 [X]EP0271872  (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * example 7; claim - *;
 [A]WO9118859  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 7-10 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0219928  (STANDARD OIL CO OHIO [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 1 - page 3, paragraph 1; example -; claim - *;
 [DA]WO9812163  (EXFLUOR RES CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * example -; claim - *
 [X]  C. BASSILANA ET. AL., "Synthesis of new beta-hydroxylated and beta-carboxylated bisquaternary ammonium salts containing fluorinated spacer groups.", JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 92, page 109-117, XP004149723 [X] 1 * page 110, compound B *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1139(98)00266-8
 [X]  C.B. SERRURIER ET. AL., "Synthèse de nouveaux diépoxides hautement fluorés, précurseurs de tensioactifs bolaphiles à espaceur fluoré.", JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 87, pages 37 - 40, XP004108765 [X] 1 * page 39, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 40, column 1, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1139(97)00045-6