Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037120

EP1037120 - Toner container and toner replenishing mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  27.03.2009
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 29.04.2009  [2009/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Omata, Kazuhiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Yamada, Yusuke, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Murakami, Katsuya, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Tazawa, Fumio, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/38]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/38]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00105589.616.03.2000
[2000/38]
Priority number, dateJP1999007214717.03.1999         Original published format: JP 7214799
JP1999037405128.12.1999         Original published format: JP 37405199
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037120
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1037120
Date:23.04.2008
[2008/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/08
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
TitleGerman:Tonerbehälter und Tonernachfüllvorrichtung[2000/38]
English:Toner container and toner replenishing mechanism[2000/38]
French:Récipient de toner et dispositif de réapprovisionnement en toner[2000/38]
Examination procedure23.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/49]
08.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH08146746  (RICOH KK) [X] 1-6,8,10-15,17-19 * abstract * [A] 7,9,16;
 [A]JPS4990133  (---) [A] 1-19 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JPH10339993  (CANON KK) [A] 1,10,15,18 * abstract *