Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020355

EP1020355 - Automatic ice bagger [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/29]Automatic ice bagger with self-contained sanitizing system
[2002/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Packaged Ice IP, Inc.
3535 Travis Street Suite 170
Dallas, TX 75204 / US
[2003/42]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
PACKAGED ICE, INC.
P.O. Box 79233
Houston, TX 77279-9233 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Schroeder, Alfred A
2811 Whisper Fawn
San Antonio, TX 78230 / US
02 / McGuar, Perry
Apt. No. 1315, 13400 Blanco Road
San Antonio, TX 78216 / US
03 / Chadwell, Thomas Joseph
3307 Stallion Creek
San Antonio, TX 78247 / US
[2000/43]
Former [2000/29]01 / Schroeder, Alfred A
2811 Whisper Fawn
San Antonio, TX 78230 / US
02 / McGuar, Perry
Apt. No. 1315, 13400 Blanco Road
San Antonio, TX 78216 / US
03 / Chadwell, Thomas Joseph
3539 Oakhorn
San Antonio, TX 78247 / US
Representative(s)Shanks, Andrew , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/27]Shanks, Andrew , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Former [2000/29]Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date00105810.629.10.1994
[2001/24]
Priority number, dateUS1993014543429.10.1993         Original published format: US 145434
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1020355
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP1020355
Date:27.06.2001
[2001/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020355
Date:10.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP30.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65B5/06, B65B3/28, F25C5/00
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum automatischen Verpacken von Eis in Beuteln[2002/33]
English:Automatic ice bagger[2002/33]
French:Ensacheuse automatique de glace[2002/33]
Former [2000/29]Vorrichtung zum automatischen Verpacken von Eis in Beuteln mit einem intergrierten System zum Reinigen und Desinfizieren
Former [2000/29]Automatic ice bagger with self-contained sanitizing system
Former [2000/29]Ensacheuse automatique de glace à système d'assainissement intégré
Examination procedure03.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
09.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2003Fee for grant paid
03.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95901722.9  / EP0725747
Opposition(s)13.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
12.09.200007   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR10.12.2003
IT10.12.2003
DE11.03.2004
ES21.03.2004
[2007/35]
Former [2006/14]FR10.12.2003
DE11.03.2004
ES21.03.2004
Former [2005/12]DE11.03.2004
ES21.03.2004
Former [2004/46]ES21.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5109651  (STUART JAMES F [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 17; figure - *;
 [A]US3918266  (GINDY IRVING W, et al) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 65 - column 5, line 32; figure - *;
 [A]EP0431207  (WESSA THEO [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 32; figure - *
by applicantUS4368608
 US5109651