Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039048

EP1039048 - Toilet cistern [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daigler GmbH
Im Reihing 3
72818 Trochtelfingen-Steinhilben / DE
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Daigler, Matthias
Rathausstrasse 27
72818 Trochtelfingen/Steinhilben / DE
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Möbus, Daniela
Patentanwältin Dr. Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85
72764 Reutlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Möbus, Daniela, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Möbus, Dr.-Ing. Daniela Möbus, Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Schwan, Hindenburgstrasse 65
72762 Reutlingen / DE
Application number, filing date00105830.420.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateDE1999205023U19.03.1999         Original published format: DE 29905023 U
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039048
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039048
Date:12.12.2001
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:E03D1/00
[2000/39]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/36]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Toilettenspülkasten[2000/39]
English:Toilet cistern[2000/39]
French:Réservoir de chasse d'eau[2000/39]
Examination procedure13.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/14]
24.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.08.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.04.200203   M06   Fee paid on   04.04.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1042813  (HAROLD ERIC FRIDAY) [X] 1,3,5 * page 2, line 37 - line 47; figure 2 *;
 [X]EP0735207  (FRIATEC KERAMIK KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [X] 1,3,5 * column 3, line 41 - line 59; figure - *;
 [X]US2324756  (BOMBARD CHARLES P) [X] 1 * column 2, line 7 - line 13; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2648848  (WIRKUS ALLEN J) [X] 1 * column 1, line 29 - line 49; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]  "BEI FRIABLOCK GEHT'S DRUNTER UND DRUBERÜ", DER OSTERREICHISCHE INSTALLATEUR, BOHMANN DRUCK UND VERLAG, AT, (1995), vol. 48, no. 7/8, pages 28 - 31, XP000548155 [A] 2,6 * page 28, line 3 - line 7 * * page 30, line 2 - line 7 *