Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039146

EP1039146 - Pilot operated filling valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.08.2005  [2005/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAWE Hydraulik GmbH & Co. KG
Streitfeldstrasse 25
81673 München / DE
[2003/23]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
HEILMEIER & WEINLEIN Fabrik für Oel-Hydraulik GmbH & Co. KG
Streitfeldstrasse 25
81673 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Neumair, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Dorfstrasse 3
85402 Thalhausen / DE
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00105865.020.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateDE1999205322U23.03.1999         Original published format: DE 29905322 U
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1039146
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039146
Date:25.08.2004
Language:DE
[2004/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:F15B15/22
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   IT [2001/24]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hydraulisch entsperrbares Füllventil[2000/39]
English:Pilot operated filling valve[2000/39]
French:Soupape de remplissage pilotée[2000/39]
Examination procedure24.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
28.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.07.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
26.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2004Fee for grant paid
15.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.05.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.05.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0663270  (DUSS MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,6,8,9 * column 7, line 9 - line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0287434  (GRATZMUELLER C A) [A] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 33 - line 38; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB1209088  (MASSEY FERGUSON PERKINS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,4 * page 2, line 64 - line 92; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE7931561U  (KNORR-BREMSE GMBH) [A] 1,2,5 * page 2, line 25 - line 30; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2782765  (ROBINSON HERBERT M) [A] 1,2,4-8 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 26; figure 1 *